IL HB0256 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides for the election (rather than appointment) of the board of trustees of the City Colleges of Chicago beginning with the 2023 consolidated election. Provides that the City of Chicago shall be subdivided into 20 trustee districts by the General Assembly for seats on the board of trustees, in addition to one at-large trustee. Makes related changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COM COL-CHICAGO-ELECT BOARD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2022-01-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
2022-01-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2022-01-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2022-01-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-12-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2021-12-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2021-12-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-12-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
2021-03-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2021-02-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Ethics & Elections Committee
2021-02-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-02-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1108057-1Amended CodeCitation Text
1108057-2Amended CodeCitation Text
1108057-2.1New CodeSee Bill Text
1108057-2.2New CodeSee Bill Text
1108057-2.3New CodeSee Bill Text
1108057-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback