IL HB0256 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the Interscholastic Athletic Organization Act. Requires each applicant seeking licensure or certification by an interscholastic athletic organization to be a game official and each person renewing such licensure or certification on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act to authorize a fingerprint-based criminal history records check to determine whether the person has committed a disqualifying offense. Sets forth the records check procedure. Requires the interscholastic athletic organization to further check the person's information against the Statewide Sex Offender Database and the Statewide Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Database. Prohibits an interscholastic athletic organization from licensing or certifying a person as a game official or renewing a game official's license or certificate if that person has not undergone a criminal history records check or has committed an offense requiring the person to register as a sex offender under the Sex Offender Registration Act or as a violent offender against youth under the Murderer and Violent Offender Against Youth Registration Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INTERSCHOLASTIC ATHLETIC ORG

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-19HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105251.25New CodeSee Bill Text
2026052605-326New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback