IL HB0255 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Police and Community Relations Improvement Act. Provides that in the case of a law enforcement officer-involved death, the chief judge of the circuit court of the circuit in which the law enforcement officer-involved death occurred shall appoint a special prosecutor to review the report of the investigators assigned to investigate an officer-involved death and to prosecute the officer involved in the death, if the special prosecutor determines that there is a basis for the prosecution. Amends the Counties Code to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SPECIAL PROSECUTOR-APPOINTMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2021-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-02-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
507271-10Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-9008Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback