IL HB0246 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0227
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to the textbook block grant program, provides that the textbooks authorized to be purchased must include the roles and contributions of all people protected under the Illinois Human Rights Act and must be non-discriminatory as to any of the characteristics under the Act. Provides that textbooks purchased with grant funds must be non-discriminatory. Provides that in public schools only, the teaching of history of the United States shall include a study of the roles and contributions of lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender people in the history of this country and this State. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
SCH CD-HISTORY-LGBT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 42 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 42 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0227 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-017-000 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-002-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-13 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-042-000 |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-02-26 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2019-02-26 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-02-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-15 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2019-02-15 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2019-02-14 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2019-02-14 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2019-02-14 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2019-02-13 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2019-02-13 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2019-02-13 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-13 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-13 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-13 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-13 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-13 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-13 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-13 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-13 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2019-02-13 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2019-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 013-007-000 |
2019-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-01-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-01-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-01-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |