IL HB0240 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a public adjuster shall ensure that a contract between a public adjuster and insured contains the email address of the public adjuster. Provides that a public adjuster shall provide the insurer with an exact copy of the contract with the insured by email within 2 business days after execution of the contract. Provides that a public adjuster shall not provide services until a written contract with the insured has been executed and an exact copy of the contract has been provided to the insurer. Provides that, at the option of an insured, any contract between a public adjuster and the insured shall be voidable for 5 business days after the copy of the contract has been received by the insurer. Provides that the insured may void the contract by notifying the public adjuster in writing by sending an email to the email address shown on the contract. Repeals the Public Insurance Adjusters and Registered Firms Article of the Illinois Insurance Code. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CODE-PUBLIC ADJUSTERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-05-04SenateFirst Reading
2021-05-04SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2021-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 28, 2021
2021-04-27SenateArrive in Senate
2021-04-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2021-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 015-000-000
2021-04-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
2021-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2021-04-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 019-000-000
2021-03-22HouseReported Back To Insurance Committee;
2021-03-22HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Insurance Committee; 003-000-000
2021-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg
2021-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2021-03-09HouseTo Special Issues (INS) Subcommittee
2021-03-05HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg
2021-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg
2021-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2021-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2021-02-23HouseAssigned to Insurance Committee
2021-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2021-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21551575Amended CodeCitation Text
2155Art. XXXI.75Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback