IL HB0238 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-20 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-20 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that a taxing district may order the county clerk to abate any portion of its taxes on property used by a business that did not have a location in the State in the previous taxable year. Provides that the abatement may not exceed $1,000,000 for all taxing districts in any taxable year. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-ABATE NEW BUSINESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2015-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2015-02-03 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-23 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=238&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0238.htm |