IL HB0237 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code and the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that upon the assignment to the Department of Healthcare and Family Services of the right to collect a child support obligation, additional interest on the amount of the obligation owed to the State ceases to accrue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILD SUPPORT-INTEREST ACCRUAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-28HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-28HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2017-05-28HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2017-03-14HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-001-000
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-08HouseRemains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-08HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-02-24HouseTo Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-15HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305510-1Amended CodeCitation Text
735512-109Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback