IL HB0222 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Repeals provisions concerning the use of soybean oil-based ink in contracts for printing services. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROCUREMENT-SOY INK REPEAL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-04SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-03-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-03-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-15SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-15SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-15SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-03-14HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-001-000
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-03-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-03-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-02-16HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-02-16HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-002-000
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-01-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-01-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-06HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3050045-15Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback