IL HB0220 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Wage Insurance Act. Establishes a wage insurance program to be administered by the Department of Employment Security. Provides that an individual is eligible for benefits if the individual is a claimant under the Unemployment Insurance Act at the time the individual obtains reemployment and is not employed by the employer from which the individual was last separated. Provides for benefits in an amount sufficient to pay the individual the difference between the wage the individual received at the time of separation from the employer by which the individual was employed immediately before becoming a claimant under the Unemployment Insurance Act and the wages received from reemployment. Imposes a 0.4% tax on payroll beginning January 1, 2020. Provides that claims may be made beginning July 1, 2020. Provides for recovery of erroneous payments, hearings, penalties, unpaid tax, rules, and other matters. Creates the Wage Insurance Fund, provides for the continuing appropriation from the Fund of amounts necessary for the purposes authorized by the Act, and amends the State Finance Act to include the Wage Insurance Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Makes a corresponding change in the Freedom of Information Act.
Title
WAGE INSURANCE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | To Wage Policy and Study Subcommittee |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-28 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=220&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0220.htm |