IL HB0220 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that no municipality, county, or road district that received motor fuel tax distributions totaling more than $100,000 in the previous State fiscal year shall receive a future distribution of motor fuel tax moneys unless that municipality, county, or road district implements a disadvantaged business enterprise program setting goals for the inclusion of minority, disadvantaged, and female-owned businesses in the procurement of contracts. Provides that those programs must be certified by the Department of Transportation and shall (i) cover both professional services and construction procurement and (ii) be substantially similar to the Department of Transportation's disadvantaged business enterprise program for the region in which the municipality, county, or road district is located. Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department shall assist municipalities, counties, and road districts in implementing those programs and shall submit certain information to those municipalities, counties, and road districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MOTOR FUEL-LOCAL GOV DBE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-22HouseTo Motor Fuel Analysis Subcommittee
2017-03-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-06HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2027052705-615New CodeSee Bill Text
355058Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback