IL HB0218 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Vetoed on August 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-09 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Cannabis Control Act. Provides that the knowing possession of not more than 30 grams of any substance containing cannabis is a petty offense charged by a Uniform Cannabis Ticket with a fine of $100 (rather than a Class C misdemeanor for 2.5 grams or less, a Class B misdemeanor for more than 2.5 grams to 10 grams, and a Class A misdemeanor for more than 10 grams to 30 grams). Provides that knowing possession of more than 30 grams but not more than 500 grams of any substance containing cannabis is a Class A misdemeanor for a first offense (rather than a Class 4 felony) and a Class 4 felony for a subsequent offense (rather than a Class 3 felony). Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Establishes procedures concerning the Uniform Cannabis Ticket.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CANNABIS PENALTIES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-09HouseBill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
2015-08-25HousePlaced on Calendar Amendatory Veto August 25, 2015
2015-08-14HouseGovernor Amendatory Veto
2015-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2015-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2015-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-019-000
2015-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2015-05-21SenateMotion to Reconsider Vote - Tabled
2015-05-21SenateMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Don Harmon
2015-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-019-000
2015-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2015-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2015-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2015-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2015-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2015-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado
2015-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2015-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2015
2015-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2015-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2015-05-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015
2015-05-06SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 009-003-000
2015-05-05SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2015-04-29SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael Noland
2015-04-29SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2015-04-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-04-28SenateFirst Reading
2015-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2015-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2015-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2015-04-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-053-000
2015-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2015-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr.
2015-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2015-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2015-04-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2015-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2015-04-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2015-04-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2015-04-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2015-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice Committee; 007-002-000
2015-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2015-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2015-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2015-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee
2015-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2015-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2015-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris
2015-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan
2015-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack
2015-04-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2015-04-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2015-04-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-04-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2015-03-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2015-03-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2015-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2015-03-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2015-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
2015-03-13HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2015-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2015-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2015-03-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2015-03-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 006-004-000
2015-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Restorative Justice Committee; by Voice Vote
2015-03-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2015-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee
2015-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2015-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2015-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin
2015-02-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris
2015-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris
2015-02-04HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2015-02-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2015-02-03HouseAssigned to Restorative Justice Committee
2015-01-28HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2015-01-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2015-01-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-01-23HouseFirst Reading
2015-01-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7205501Amended CodeCitation Text
72055010Amended CodeCitation Text
7205504Amended CodeCitation Text
7205509Amended CodeCitation Text
7255111-3.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=218&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0218.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0218eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0218enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0218gms.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0218ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0218ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0218ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0218ham004.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/house/09900HB0218_04232015_004000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900HB0218_05212015_019000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback