IL HB0217 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Criminal History in College Applications Act. Provides that a public university or community college may not inquire about or consider an applicant's criminal history information at any time during the admission decision-making process, except as required by federal law or specified provisions of the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois or the Medical School Matriculant Criminal History Records Check Act, if applicable. Allows a public university or community college to use a multi-institution application, even if the application inquires about criminal history, but requires the public university or community college to disregard the information for the admission process. Allows a public university or community college to inquire about criminal history for certain purposes after the admission decision-making process, but forbids a public university or community college from rescinding an admission offer based on the information. Authorizes a public university or community college to provide certain information. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM HISTORY IN COLLEGE APPS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2019-03-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-03-06HouseDo Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-008-000
2019-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-02-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-28HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback