IL HB0215 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $250,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois Housing Development Authority for grants to municipalities with a population over 1,000,000 for the rehabilitation of vacant and abandoned residential housing. Provides that funds may also be used for the acquisition of property and construction related to vacant and abandoned residential housing. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
$IHDA-REHAB ABANDONED HOUSING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-26 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=215&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB0215.pdf |