IL HB0215 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax checkoff for the Mental Health Income Tax Checkoff Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund may be used by the Department of Public Health for the purpose of making grants to providers of mental health services in the State. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-CHECKOFF-MENTAL HEALTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-24HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text
301056z-102New CodeSee Bill Text
355507GGGNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback