IL HB0211 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $250,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois Housing Development Authority for grants to municipalities with a population over 1,000,000 for the rehabilitation of vacant and abandoned residential housing. Provides that funds may also be used for the acquisition of property and construction related to vacant and abandoned residential housing. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
$IHDA-REHAB ABANDONED HOUSING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-09-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |