IL HB0207 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the 24/7 Sobriety and Drug Monitoring Program Act. Provides that there is created a statewide 24/7 sobriety and drug monitoring program administered by the probation department in counties that have adopted the program. Provides that a court in a participating county, as a condition of bond, pretrial release, sentence, suspended sentence, probation, or conditional discharge, may: (1) require a person who has been charged, pled guilty, or convicted of a crime in which the abuse of alcohol or drugs was a contributing factor in the commission of the crime to abstain from alcohol or drugs for a specific period of time; and (2) require the person to be subject to testing to determine the presence of alcohol or drugs in his or her body: (A) at least twice a day at a central location where immediate sanctions may be applied; (B) if twice a day testing creates a documented hardship or is geographically impractical by an alternate method as determined by the court and consistent with this Section in which timely sanctions may be effectively applied; or (C) if testing only for drugs, as frequently as practicable, as determined by the court. Provides that the Division of Probation Services of the Supreme Court shall assist in the creation and administration of the 24/7 sobriety and drug monitoring program in the manner provided in this Act in the participating counties. Provides that the Division shall also assist participating counties in which a 24/7 program exists in determining alternatives to incarceration. Provides that the probation department in the participating county may designate a third party to provide the testing services. Effective immediately.
Title
24/7 SOBRIETY&DRUG MONITORING
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=207&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0207.htm |