IL HB0207 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Employment of Illinois Workers on Public Works Act. Provides that a person convicted of violating the Act, who previously was convicted of one or more violations of the Act that occurred after the bill's effective date, may not receive any State contract for one year following the most recent conviction.
Title
PUBLIC WORKS-ILLINOIS WORKERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-03-11 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-03-10 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-02-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2009-02-24 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-02-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-02-11 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski | |
2009-02-11 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson | |
2009-02-11 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-02-11 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-02-11 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski | |
2009-02-10 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Labor Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-02-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson | |
2009-02-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-20 | First Reading | |
2009-01-15 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=207&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0207.htm |