IL HB0205 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Makes changes to the definitions of "brewer", "distributor", "importing distributor", and "brew pub". Defines "barrel" as 31 U.S. gallons. Provides that a licensed brewer may make sales and deliveries of beer to importing distributors, distributors, and to non-licensees. Further provides that a licensed brewer may sell to retailers provided that the licensed brewer (i) manufactures 60,000 barrels or less of beer per year and (ii) obtains an importing distributor's license or distributor's license in accordance with the provisions of the Act. Provides that a brew pub licensee may sell his or her own manufactured beer to retailers provided that he or she obtains an importing distributor's license or distributor's license. Provides that a brew pub licensee shall not allow the sale for off-premises consumption or to retailers in the aggregate of more than 50,000 gallons of manufactured beer per year. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR - BREWER LICENSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2011-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 1-3.09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 1-3.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 1-3.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 1-3.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 1-3.38 | New Code | See Bill Text |
235 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |