IL HB0203 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the No Representation Without Population Act. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall collect and maintain an electronic record of the legal residence, outside of any correctional facility, and other demographic data for each person entering its custody after January 1, 2019. Provides for the minimum records that the Department shall maintain. Requires the Department to provide certain information to the Secretary of State after the decennial census. Requires the Secretary of State to request similar information from agencies that operate federal incarceration facilities. Requires the Secretary of State to prepare redistricting data to reflect the incarcerated persons at their residential address, rather than the address of the facility in which the person is incarcerated. Provides that for persons for whom a legal residence is unknown or not in the State, and for all persons reported in the census as residing in a federal correctional facility for whom a report was not provided, the Secretary of State to allocate the person to a State unit not tied to a specific determined geographic location, as other residents with unknown addresses are allocated. Requires the data collected to only be used as a basis for determining Legislative and Representative Districts. Prohibits the use of the data for the distribution of State or federal aid. Contains severability provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
NO REPRESENTATION WITHOUT POP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-09-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-09-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-09-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-09-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-09-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-08-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-08-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-08-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-08-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2019-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-05-24 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-19 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |