IL HB0200 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State may issue special registration plates designated as Peace Officers Memorial Foundation of Cook County license plates to active or retired Cook County peace officers and their family members, surviving family members of deceased law enforcement officers, and members of or donors to the Peace Officers Memorial Foundation of Cook County. Provides that the issuance and renewal fee shall be $25. Creates the Peace Officers Memorial Foundation of Cook County Fund. Makes corresponding changes in the Illinois Lottery Law, the State Finance Act, and the Illinois Income Tax Act.
Title
PEACE OFFICERS MEMORIAL PLATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Tabled |
2019-02-21 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2019-02-13 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-19 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 21.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 507HHH | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=200&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB0200.htm |