IL HB0191 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the maximum amount of hours a part-time police officer employed by one or more units of local government may work is 1,560 hours per unit per year.
Title
LOCGOV-PART-TIME POLICE HOURS
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Eddy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | House | Tabled By Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy |
2011-03-10 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2011-03-08 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Roger L. Eddy |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Labor Committee |
2011-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-18 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Roger L. Eddy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 705 | 8.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=191&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB0191.htm |