IL HB0189 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Makes a technical change in the short title Section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIVIL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-001
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-25SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 010-000-001
2017-05-24SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-05-24SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-03SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-001
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-001-000
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2017-04-05HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-04-03HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. André Thapedi
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73551-101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=189&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0189.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0189eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0189enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0189ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0189ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0189ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0189ham004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0189ham005.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB0189_04272017_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB0189_05292017_022000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback