IL HB0185 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. To the list of purposes of the Act, adds recognizing that the involvement of each parent for equal time is presumptively in the children's best interests. Deletes language providing that nothing in the Act requires that each parent be allocated decision-making responsibilities. Provides that there is a rebuttable presumption in favor of equal parenting time. Relocates provisions listing factors for the court to consider in determining a child's bests interests for purposes of allocating parenting time. In specified situations, requires the court to issue a written decision stating its specific findings of fact and conclusions of law in support of its ruling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMDMA-EQUAL PARENTING TIME

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-03-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-02-08HouseTo Family Law Subcommittee
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-01-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-18HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7505102Amended CodeCitation Text
7505602.10Amended CodeCitation Text
7505602.5Amended CodeCitation Text
7505602.7Amended CodeCitation Text
7505603.10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback