IL HB0183 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee
2017-03-28HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-27HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72051-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback