IL HB0183 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Department Promotion Act. Provides that review sessions held after an examination has been given for the purpose of gathering feedback from candidates shall be at no cost to the candidates. Effective immediately.
Title
FIRE DEPT-EXAM REVIEW SESSIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-18 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 742 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=183&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB0183.htm |