IL HB0181 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Credit Information in Personal Insurance Act. Provides that an insurer that uses credit information to underwrite risks shall not (i) take an adverse action against a consumer solely because he or she does not have a credit card account; (ii) take an adverse action against a consumer based on credit information, unless and until the insurer satisfies certain conditions, and (iii) use certain credit information as a negative factor in any insurance scoring methodology or in reviewing credit information for the purpose of underwriting or rating a policy of personal insurance. Provides that an insurer authorized to do business in this State may not take adverse action against a consumer who has tendered notice of an extraordinary life event unless and until the insurer has reviewed the consumer's notification and provided the consumer with a written explanation for its decision. Provides that if the insured has overpaid premium due to incorrect or incomplete credit information, the insurer shall refund to the insured the amount of overpayment calculated back to the shorter of either the last 12 months of coverage or the actual policy period. Provides that the insurer must provide the disclosure statement required under the provision each time the insurer obtains the consumer's credit report. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CRDT INFO-PERSONAL INSURANCE
Sponsors
Rep. James Brosnahan [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Deborah Graham [D] |
Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] | Rep. Andre Thapedi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. James D. Brosnahan | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-30 | Fiscal Note Filed | |
2009-03-30 | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed | |
2009-03-27 | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed | |
2009-03-27 | Home Rule Note Filed | |
2009-03-26 | Balanced Budget Note Filed | |
2009-03-26 | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed | |
2009-03-25 | Pension Note Filed | |
2009-03-25 | State Debt Impact Note Filed | |
2009-03-25 | Judicial Note Filed | |
2009-03-25 | Correctional Note Filed | |
2009-03-25 | Fiscal Note Filed | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-10 | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 008-005-000 | |
2009-02-20 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2009-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2009-02-05 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-02-05 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee | |
2009-01-14 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-14 | First Reading | |
2009-01-13 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Deborah L. Graham |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=181&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0181.htm |