IL HB0180 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Wrongful Prosecution Commission Act. Creates the Wrongful Prosecution Commission as an independent commission under the Illinois Human Rights Commission for administrative purposes. Defines "claim of wrongful prosecution" as a claim by or on behalf of a living person convicted of a crime in a county of more than 3,000,000 inhabitants asserting that the person was falsely incriminated for the crime and there is credible evidence related to allegations of the use of false evidence to obtain the conviction. Defines other terms. Provides that the Commission shall conduct inquiries into claims of wrongful prosecution. Provides that if the Commission concludes there is sufficient evidence of wrongful prosecution to merit judicial review, the Chair of the Commission shall request that the Chief Judge of the Circuit Court of Cook County assign the case to a trial judge for consideration. Provides that the Act applies to claims of wrongful prosecution filed not later than 5 years after the effective date of the Act. Repeals the Act 10 years after the effective date. Effective immediately.
Title
WRONGFUL PROSECUTION COMM'N
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2020-02-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-01-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-01-28 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2019-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed |
2019-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Table Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Table Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-03-27 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-17 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |