IL HB0180 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Salaries Act. Decreases the annual salary of the Governor, Lieutenant Governor, Secretary of State, Comptroller, Treasurer, and Attorney General by 10% beginning on January 9, 2019. Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Decreases the annual salary and committee service stipends of General Assembly members by 10% beginning on January 11, 2017 for each member of the House of Representatives and each member of the Senate elected to a 2-year term commencing January 14, 2015 and beginning January 9, 2019 for all other members of the Senate. Effective immediately.
Title
REDUCE GA & EXECUTIVE SALARIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 115 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 290 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=180&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0180.htm |