IL HB0175 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning conditions for basic maintenance grants of aid to the aged, blind, or disabled.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC AID-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-05-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-04SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-24HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30553-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback