IL HB0169 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Building Commission Act. Makes a technical change to a Section concerning the short title.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0290 |
2017-08-24 | House | Effective Date August 24, 2017 |
2017-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2017 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 006-000-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-02-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-02-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-02-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000 |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 20 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |