IL HB0167 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
Hearing: Feb 27 @ 8:30 am in Room C-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Administration Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that subject to federal approval, on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the LINK card issued by the Department of Human Services for the purpose of enabling cardholders to obtain Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program benefits or cash shall only be used for in-state transactions. Provides that the Department shall adopt rules necessary to implement this provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-LINK CARD-RESTRICTED USE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-02-06HouseTo Public Benefits Subcommittee
2019-02-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-14HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305512-4.4aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback