IL HB0167 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on July 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on July 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Prohibits knowingly discharging a laser into the cockpit of an aircraft in the process of taking off, landing, or while in flight. Provides that the penalty is a Class A misdemeanor. Defines "aircraft" and "laser".
Title
CRIM CD-LASER AT AIRCRAFT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-21 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0153 |
2011-07-21 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-07-21 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 3, 2011 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2011-02-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2011-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan |
2011-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2011-02-23 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2011-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2011-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2011-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2011-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2011-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2011-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2011-02-17 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-18 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters |