IL HB0166 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning prohibited transactions.
Title
PUBLIC EMPLOYEE BENEFITS-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-04 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1166 |
2019-01-04 | House | Effective Date January 4, 2019 |
2019-01-04 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-12-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-11-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-001-000 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 28, 2018 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000 |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-11-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-11-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2018-11-14 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-11-09 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-11-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-11-07 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-02-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-02-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000 |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 1-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |