IL HB0165 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Prevailing Wage Act. Provides that prevailing wage need not be paid to workers engaged in the construction or demolition of public works when employed by or working on behalf of nonprofit organizations for educational purposes. Effective immediately.
Title
PREVAILING WAGE- NONPROFIT EDU
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-03 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2011-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2011-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2011-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Labor Committee |
2011-01-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-18 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 130 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=165&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB0165.htm |