IL HB0163 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC EMPLOYEE BENEFITS-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-15HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4051-101.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback