IL HB0160 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-22 - Effective Date August 20, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-22 - Effective Date August 20, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cannabis Control Act. Provides that the enhanced penalties for delivering cannabis in a school or on school property do not apply to a violation in or on the grounds of a building that is designated as a school but is no longer operational or active as a school, including a building that is temporarily or permanently closed by a unit of local government. Effective immediately.
Title
CANNABIS-ENROLLED STUDENT
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 20, 2019 |
2019-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0429 |
2019-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 030-018-000 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-003-000 |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-049-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-19 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-12 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 550 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |