IL HB0160 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the earned income tax credit.
Title
REVENUE-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-09-28 | House | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2017-06-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-06-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-06-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-06-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-06-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-06-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-05-31 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 063-050-000 |
2017-05-31 | House | Motion Lost |
2017-05-31 | House | Motion - Move to Previous Question Rep. André Thapedi |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-05-31 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2017-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2017-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-05-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-05-28 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-25 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-001-000 |
2017-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-05-15 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-15 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-02-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-02-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000 |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |