IL HB0152 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on August 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0470
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that a school board shall require that each school building in the district be equipped with approved carbon monoxide alarms in accordance with the rules of the State Fire Marshal. Sets forth how the alarms are to be powered. Provides that the State Fire Marshal shall, by rule, (i) determine the number of alarms a public school building must have and where those alarms must be located, (ii) require that the alarms be in operating condition and be inspected annually, (iii) exempt school buildings from the alarm requirement if they do not have or are not close to any sources of carbon monoxide, and (iv) require plans, protocols, and procedures in response to the activation of a carbon monoxide alarm. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-CARBON MONOXIDE ALARMS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-16 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-27HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0470
2015-08-27HouseEffective Date January 1, 2016
2015-08-27HouseGovernor Approved
2015-07-15HouseSent to the Governor
2015-06-16HousePassed Both Houses
2015-06-16HouseHouse Concurs
2015-06-16HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 106-001-000
2015-06-16House3/5 Vote Required
2015-06-16HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight; 003-001-000
2015-06-15HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight
2015-06-15HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2015-06-15HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kathleen Willis
2015-06-15HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015
2015-06-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2015-06-15HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2015-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2015-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2015-05-31HouseArrived in House
2015-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2015-05-22SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
2015-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2015-05-20SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2015-05-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2015
2015-05-20SenateSecond Reading
2015-05-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2015
2015-05-13SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-000-000
2015-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2015-05-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2015-05-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2015-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2015-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2015-05-06SenatePostponed - Public Health
2015-05-05SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2015-04-29SenateAssigned to Public Health
2015-04-21SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-04-21SenateFirst Reading
2015-04-21SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2015-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2015-04-21SenateArrive in Senate
2015-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2015-04-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2015-04-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2015-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2015-04-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2015-03-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2015-03-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-03-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2015-03-11HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2015-03-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2015-03-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2015-03-11HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight; 004-001-000
2015-03-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight; by Voice Vote
2015-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2015-03-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight
2015-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2015-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2015-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2015-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2015-03-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-03-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2015-02-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2015-02-03HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing Oversight
2015-01-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-01-14HouseFirst Reading
2015-01-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.56New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-18.49New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=152&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0152.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0152eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0152enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/99/099-0470.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0152ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0152ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB0152sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/house/09900HB0152_04162015_032000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900HB0152_05312015_012000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/house/09900HB0152_06162015_002000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback