IL HB0146 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act in the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the City of Waukegan may utilize revenues, other than State sales tax increment revenues, from redevelopment project area for eligible costs in another redevelopment project area. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-WAUKEGAN REDEVELOP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-02-20 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |