IL HB0123 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Statute on Statutes. Makes a technical change in a Section regarding the application of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0119
2017-08-18HouseEffective Date August 18, 2017
2017-08-18HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2017
2017-05-24SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateDo Pass State Government; 007-000-000
2017-05-19SenateReported Back To State Government; 003-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-12SenateTo Subcommittee on State Designations
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2017-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-16HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-003-000
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5701Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback