IL HB0104 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Provides for registration under the Act of a person convicted of a battery when the court: (1) finds that the battery was sexually motivated as defined in the Sex Offender Management Board Act; and (2) in its discretion requires the person to register under the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SEX OFFENDER REG-BATTERY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-16HouseTo Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee
2017-02-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-05HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7301503Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback