IL HB0102 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that, in addition to any other tax that may be imposed, if a municipality adopts a responsible bid ordinance that is approved by the Department of Transportation, then the municipality may also impose a tax on motor fuel at a rate not to exceed $0.03 per gallon. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-005-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-007-000 |
2019-03-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2019-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000 |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2018-12-10 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 350 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |