IL HB0097 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning expedited long-term care eligibility determination and enrollment.
Title
PUBLIC AID-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Re-assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-01-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-12-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 11-5.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |