IL HB0083 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-21 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Allows the dependents of an exonerated person to receive a grant for exonerated persons. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
HIGHER ED-GRANT-EXONERATED
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Cyril Nichols [D] |
Sen. Lakesia Collins [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 70 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 27, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-043-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 010-006-000 |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 947 | 62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |