IL HB0083 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
COURTS-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Yarbrough [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] |
Rep. Derrick Smith [D] | Rep. Annazette Collins [D] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0362 |
2011-08-15 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-18 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2011-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2011 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-001-002 |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2011-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Annazette R. Collins |
2011-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2011-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-025-000 |
2011-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2011-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2011-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Withdrawn by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2011-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2011-03-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2011-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 010-001-000 |
2011-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-15 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2011-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2011-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Annazette Collins |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Annazette Collins |
2011-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2011-03-07 | House | Re-assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Annazette Collins |
2011-02-08 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2011-01-05 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Annazette Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 1-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |