IL HB0081 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-01 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Young Adult Community State Employment Plan Act. Contains a Purposes Section. Defines terms. Provides that the Department of Central Management Services shall: develop and implement plans to increase the number of young adult community members employed by State government, including those at supervisory, technical, professional, and managerial levels; prepare a Young Adult Community State Employment Plan; annually report to the General Assembly each State agency's activities that implement the Plan; and assist State agencies with training programs to meet their affirmative action and equal employment opportunity goals. Provides that each State agency shall implement programs under the Plan to increase the number of young adult community members employed by the State and report annually to the Department its activities that implement the Plan. Creates the Young Adult Community State Employment Plan Advisory Council, consisting of 11 members appointed by the Governor, each of whom shall be a subject matter expert on the young adult community. Provides that members shall serve without compensation, but shall be reimbursed for reasonable expenses from appropriated funds. Includes other provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
YOUNG ADULT STATE EMPLOYMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | House | Tabled |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-19 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-02-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |