IL HB0078 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0153
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0153
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Farm Fresh Schools Program Act. Provides that the Department of Agriculture, in cooperation with the State Board of Education and the Department of Public Health, shall create the Farm Fresh Schools Program. Provides that the intent of the Program is to reduce obesity and improve nutrition and public health, as well as strengthen local agricultural economies by increasing access to and promoting the consumption of locally grown fruits and vegetables in schools and increasing physical activities and programs that promote pupil wellness. Provides that the Department of Agriculture and the State Board of Education shall jointly administer a process to review grant proposals and award grants on a competitive basis to eligible applicants to implement the Program. Creates the Farm Fresh Schools Program Fund as a special fund in the State treasury.
Title
FARM FRESH SCHOOLS PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-07 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0153 | |
2009-08-07 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-08-07 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-13 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-13 | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 | |
2009-05-13 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 008-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 26, 2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-02-25 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000 | |
2009-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley | |
2009-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-02-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-24 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2009-02-19 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-18 | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 | |
2009-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-02-09 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-02-05 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-02-05 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-02-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-02-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-02-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Bassi | |
2009-02-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | |
2009-01-14 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-14 | First Reading | |
2009-01-09 | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Sandy Cole |