IL HB0062 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0029
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Central Illinois Economic Development Authority for its FY20 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$CENTRAL IL ECON DEV AUTH-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 95 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 95 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0029
2019-06-28HouseEffective Date July 1, 2019
2019-06-28HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-07HouseSent to the Governor
2019-06-01HousePassed Both Houses
2019-06-01HouseHouse Concurs
2019-06-01House3/5 Vote Required
2019-06-01HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 095-018-001
2019-06-01HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 095-018-001
2019-06-01HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2019-06-01HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2019-06-01HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-06-01HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-06-01HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-06-01HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-06-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2019-06-01HouseArrived in House
2019-06-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-006-000
2019-06-01Senate3/5 Vote Required
2019-06-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-06-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2019-06-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; J. Cullerton
2019-06-01SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-05-31SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2019-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2019
2019-05-30SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-05-30SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2019-05-30SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-05-29SenateFirst Reading
2019-05-29SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-05-29SenateArrive in Senate
2019-05-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-039-000
2019-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-29HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-09HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2019-04-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2019-02-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
2019-01-29HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-12-10HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=62&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB0062.pdf
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB0062eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB0062enr.pdf
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/Approps/101-0029.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB0062sam001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB0062sam002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB0062_05292019_020000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB0062_06012019_001000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB0062sam002_06012019_033001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB0062sam001_06012019_033000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback