IL HB0060 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Amusement Ride and Attraction Safety Act. Provides that "amusement ride" includes any trampoline court. Defines "trampoline court".
Title
TRAMPOLINE COURTS-SAFETY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 79 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0255 |
2021-08-06 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 079-034-000 |
2021-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-004-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Safety; 006-000-000 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Safety |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-036-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-04-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 004-002-000 |
2021-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-03-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 006-000-000 |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-02-23 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-02-10 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | First Reading |
2021-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 85 | 2-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |