IL HB0040 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Don Harmon
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Removes a provision prohibiting the non-contributory portion of a program of health-benefits from including the expenses of obtaining an abortion. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Removes a provision excluding abortions or induced miscarriages or premature births from the list of services provided under the State's medical assistance program. Removes language providing for the adoption of rules to prohibit a physician from providing medical assistance to anyone eligible for medical assistance benefits if the physician has been found guilty of willfully and wantonly performing an abortion procedure upon a woman who was not pregnant at the time of the procedure. Removes other provisions concerning abortion restrictions. Amends the Problem Pregnancy Health Services and Care Act. Removes language prohibiting the Department of Human Services from making grants to nonprofit agencies and organizations that use such grants to refer or counsel for, or perform, abortions. Amends the Illinois Abortion Law of 1975. Provides that it is the intention of the General Assembly to reasonably regulate abortion in conformance with the legal standards set forth in the decisions of the United States Supreme Court of January 22, 1973. Removes language concerning the General Assembly's declaration that the unborn child is a human being from the time of conception and is, therefore, a legal person for purposes of the unborn child's right to life. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ABORTION-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 61 N: 55 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion in House (Y: 61 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10SenateMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 033-022-000
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-004-000
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-04-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-26SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-26SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-055-000
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Request as Amended is Inapplicable
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed 061-055-000
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Request as Amended is Inapplicable
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed 061-054-000
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-04-25HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-03-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2017-02-16HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-02-15HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2017-02-15HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2017-02-15HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2017-02-15HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-02-15HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2017-02-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-02-14HouseJudicial Note Filed
2017-02-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-09HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2017-02-08HouseJudicial Note Filed
2017-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-005-000
2017-02-08HousePension Note Filed
2017-02-08HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2017-02-08HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-08HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-08HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-08HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-08HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-08HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-08HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-08HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-08HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-08HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-01-25HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-11HouseFirst Reading
2016-12-20HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-8Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-9Amended CodeCitation Text
30556-1Amended CodeCitation Text
4102304-100Amended CodeCitation Text
53756Amended CodeCitation Text
53756.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7205101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback